Announcements
Change - Announcement Of Resignation Of Executive Director And Chief Executive Officer
Jul 31, 2018
Announcement Title | Change - Announcement of Cessation |
Date & Time of Broadcast | Jul 31, 2018 19:24 |
Status | New |
Announcement Sub Title | RESIGNATION OF EXECUTIVE DIRECTOR AND CHIEF EXECUTIVE OFFICER |
Announcement Reference | SG180731OTHRHWF8 |
Submitted By (Co./ Ind. Name) | Song Xingyi |
Designation | Non-Executive, Non-Independent Chairman |
Description (Please provide a detailed description of the event in the box below) | This announcement has been prepared by the Company and its contents have been reviewed by the Company's Sponsor, SAC Capital Private Limited (the "Sponsor"), for compliance with the relevant rules of the Singapore Exchange Securities Trading Limited (the "Exchange"). The Company's Sponsor has not independently verified the contents of this announcement. This announcement has not been examined or approved by the Exchange and the Exchange assumes no responsibility for the contents of this announcement, including the correctness of any of the statements or opinions made or reports contained in this announcement. The contact person for the Sponsor is Ms. Alicia Sun (Telephone No.: +65-6532 3829) at 1 Robinson Road, #21-02 AIA Tower, Singapore 048542. |
Additional Details | |
Name Of Person | Qian Zhongcheng |
Age | 43 |
Is effective date of cessation known? | Yes |
If yes, please provide the date | 31/07/2018 |
Detailed Reason (s) for cessation | Mr. Qian Zhongcheng is resigning as Chief Executive Officer and Executive Director of Yinda Infocomm Limited (the Company ) as he was promoted to Vice President of Shanghai Yinda Science and Technology Industrial Co Ltd, parent company of the Company, to oversee the development of the company. SAC Capital Private Limited, after having interviewed Mr. Qian Zhongcheng, is satisfied that other than as disclosed in this announcement, there are no other reasons for the resignation of Mr. Qian Zhongcheng. |
Are there any unresolved differences in opinion on material matters between the person and the board of directors, including matters which would have a material impact on the group or its financial reporting? | No |
Is there any matter in relation to the cessation that needs to be brought to the attention of the shareholders of the listed issuer? | No |
Any other relevant information to be provided to shareholders of the listed issuer? | No |
Date of Appointment to current position | 30/09/2017 |
Does the AC have a minimum of 3 members (taking into account this cessation)? | Yes |
Number of Independent Directors currently resident in Singapore (taking into account this cessation) | 2 |
Number of cessations of appointments specified in Listing Rule 704 (7) or Catalist Rule 704 (6) over the past 12 months | 10 |
Job Title (e.g. Lead ID, AC Chairman, AC Member etc.) | Executive Director (appointed on 30 September 2017) and Chief Executive Officer (appointed on 16 April 2018). |
Role and responsibilities | Executive Director (appointed on 30 September 2017) and Chief Executive Officer (appointed on 16 April 2018). |
Familial relationship with any director and/ or substantial shareholder of the listed issuer or of any of its principal subsidiaries | Yes, Director of Yinda Pte. Ltd., the controlling shareholders of the Company. Cousin of Mr Qian Zimin, one of the directors of the subsidiary company. |
Shareholding interest in the listed issuer and its subsidiaries? | Yes |
Shareholding Details | Deemed to be interested in 120,437,180 ordinary shares or 79.23% held by Yinda Pte. Ltd. in the Company. |
Past (for the last 5 years) | NIL |
Present | Shanghai Yinda Labour Resource Co., Ltd Yinda Pte. Ltd. Yinda Technology Myanmar Co., Ltd Yinda Technology Philippines, Inc. Yinda KH Technology Co., Ltd Yinda Sdn. Bhd. Yinda Technology Singapore Pte. Ltd. Yinda Technology (Thailand) Co., Limited Yinda Technology Malaysia Sdn. Bhd. |
Attachments
- Attachment 1 (Size: 68,812 bytes)