Announcements
Change - Announcement Of Resignation Of Non-Executive And Non-Independent Director
Feb 09, 2018
Announcement Title | Change - Announcement of Cessation |
Date & Time of Broadcast | Feb 9, 2018 17:24 |
Status | New |
Announcement Sub Title | Resignation of Non-Executive and Non-Independent Director |
Announcement Reference | SG180209OTHR8KKB |
Submitted By (Co./ Ind. Name) | Qian Zhongcheng |
Designation | Executive Director |
Description (Please provide a detailed description of the event in the box below) | This announcement has been prepared by the Company and its contents have been reviewed by the Company's Sponsor, SAC Capital Private Limited (the "Sponsor"), for compliance with the relevant rules of the Singapore Exchange Securities Trading Limited (the "Exchange"). The Company's Sponsor has not independently verified the contents of this announcement. This announcement has not been examined or approved by the Exchange and the Exchange assumes no responsibility for the contents of this announcement, including the correctness of any of the statements or opinions made or reports contained in this announcement. The contact person for the Sponsor is Ms. Alicia Sun (Telephone: +65-6532 3829) at 1 Robinson Road, #21-02 AIA Tower, Singapore 048542. |
Additional Details | |
Name Of Person | Wang Zhijun |
Age | 67 |
Is effective date of cessation known? | Yes |
If yes, please provide the date | 09/02/2018 |
Detailed Reason (s) for cessation | Due to health reason. SAC Capital Private Limited, after having interviewed Mr Wang, is satisfied that other than as disclosed in this announcement, there are no other reasons for the resignation of Mr Wang. |
Are there any unresolved differences in opinion on material matters between the person and the board of directors, including matters which would have a material impact on the group or its financial reporting? | No |
Is there any matter in relation to the cessation that needs to be brought to the attention of the shareholders of the listed issuer? | No |
Any other relevant information to be provided to shareholders of the listed issuer? | No |
Date of Appointment to current position | 30/09/2017 |
Does the AC have a minimum of 3 members (taking into account this cessation)? | Yes |
Number of Independent Directors currently resident in Singapore (taking into account this cessation) | 2 |
Number of cessations of appointments specified in Listing Rule 704 (7) or Catalist Rule 704 (6) over the past 12 months | 8 |
Job Title (e.g. Lead ID, AC Chairman, AC Member etc.) | Non-Executive and Non-Independent Director |
Role and responsibilities | Non-Executive |
Familial relationship with any director and/ or substantial shareholder of the listed issuer or of any of its principal subsidiaries | Mr Wang is the spouse of Ms Song Xingyi who was appointed as Non-Executive and Non-Independent Chairman of the Company on 30 September 2017. Ms Song is also a Director of Yinda Pte. Ltd., the controlling shareholder of the Company. Mr Wang is also the father of Mr Wang Hua, who is a deemed controlling shareholder of the Company. |
Shareholding interest in the listed issuer and its subsidiaries? | Yes |
Shareholding Details | Deemed to be interested in 120,437,180 ordinary shares or 79.23% held by Yinda Pte. Ltd. in the Company. |
Past (for the last 5 years) | Nil |
Present | Anhui Diantong Communication Engineering Co., Ltd. |