Announcements
Change - Announcement Of Resignation Of Independent Director
May 28, 2021
Announcement Title | Change - Announcement of Cessation |
Date & Time of Broadcast | May 28, 2021 17:41 |
Status | New |
Announcement Sub Title | Resignation of Independent Director |
Announcement Reference | SG210528OTHRP08N |
Submitted By (Co./ Ind. Name) | Pierre Prunier |
Designation | Chief Executive Officer and Executive Director |
Description (Please provide a detailed description of the event in the box below) | Resignation of Independent Director - Ms Tang Qun This announcement has been reviewed by the Company's sponsor, SAC Capital Private Limited (the "Sponsor"). It has not been examined or approved by the Singapore Exchange Securities Trading Limited (the "SGX-ST") and the SGX-ST assumes no responsibility for the contents of this announcement, including the correctness of any of the statements or opinions made or reports contained in this announcement. The contact person for the Sponsor is Mr. Ong Hwee Li (Tel +65 6232 3210), at 1 Robinson Road, #21-00 AIA Tower, Singapore 048542. |
Additional Details | |
Name Of Person | Tang Qun |
Age | 51 |
Is effective date of cessation known? | Yes |
If yes, please provide the date | 31/05/2021 |
Detailed Reason (s) for cessation | To pursue other career opportunities. Ms Tang Qun ("Ms Tang") tendered her resignation as an Independent Director of the Company on 27 May 2021, to focus on pursuing career and business opportunities in China, having considered the recent corporate actions undertaken by Yinda Infocomm Limited (the "Company") which would require significant time and attention from the members of the Board of Directors of the Company (the "Board"). The Nominating Committee and the Board accepted her resignation and agreed that the effective date of her cessation as Independent Director of the Company be 31 May 2021. Following Ms Tang's resignation, she will also relinquish her position as Chairman of the Nominating Committee and member of the Remuneration Committee of the Company. The Sponsor, after having interviewed Ms Tang, is satisfied that, save as disclosed in this announcement, there are no material reasons for the resignation of Ms Tang as Independent Director of the Company. |
Are there any unresolved differences in opinion on material matters between the person and the board of directors, including matters which would have a material impact on the group or its financial reporting? | No |
Is there any matter in relation to the cessation that needs to be brought to the attention of the shareholders of the listed issuer? | No |
Any other relevant information to be provided to shareholders of the listed issuer? | No |
Date of Appointment to current position | 09/02/2018 |
Does the AC have a minimum of 3 members (taking into account this cessation)? | Yes |
Number of Independent Directors currently resident in Singapore (taking into account this cessation) | 3 |
Number of cessations of appointments specified in Listing Rule 704 (7) or Catalist Rule 704 (6) over the past 12 months | 3 |
Job Title (e.g. Lead ID, AC Chairman, AC Member etc.) | Independent Director, Chairman of the Nominating Committee and Member of the Remuneration Committee. |
Role and responsibilities | Non-Executive. |
Familial relationship with any director and/ or substantial shareholder of the listed issuer or of any of its principal subsidiaries | None. |
Shareholding interest in the listed issuer and its subsidiaries? | No |
Past (for the last 5 years) | Nil |
Present | Nil |